Organ | Roll | Status | From | Tom |
---|---|---|---|---|
Finansutskottet | Suppleant | 1991-09-30 12:00:00 | 1991-10-04 11:59:00 | |
Utbildningsutskottet | Suppleant | 1991-09-30 12:00:00 | 1991-10-04 11:59:00 | |
Finansutskottet | Suppleant | 1989-03-06 12:00:00 | 1991-09-29 11:59:00 | |
Utbildningsutskottet | Suppleant | 1989-03-06 12:00:00 | 1991-09-29 11:59:00 |